Trustees KENDAL MOUNTAIN SEARCH & RESCUE TEAM
Charity number: 1125680

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Dunbavin | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Caroline Young | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Adrian Davies | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lucy Jackson | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Winchester | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jules Nawal Winspear Funnell | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Burgess | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.