Accounts and annual returns HOLA (HELP ORPHANS LIVE AGAIN)

Charity Number: 1125781
Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 20 June 2023 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 October 2021 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required