HOLA (HELP ORPHANS LIVE AGAIN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activitity is the provision of funding by sponsorship for education of children from kindergarten age, through Primary and Secondary level, especially providing schooling to deprived areas where no schools exist.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kenya
Governance
- 09 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN BLEARS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN LESLIE MARCHANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IRENE THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSELL SAM GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN EDITH BLEARS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.66k | £16.19k | £12.90k | £13.20k | £9.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.16k | £12.06k | £12.26k | £12.34k | £12.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 377 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF ORPHANED CHILDREN BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN KENYA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Longford Lodge
Groby Road
Altrincham
WA14 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01619284098
- Email:
- mikble123@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
holacharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window