THE BUTTERFLY GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is the only organisation in the UK who cares for those affected by immune, auto immune and chronic disorders under the one umbrella with over 150 conditions supported primarily in Lancashire but not exclusively. The charity can be contacted directly on 01253 299 990 for full information on all its services and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackpool
Governance
- 09 September 2008: Standard registration
- 26 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.36k | £11.60k | £40.15k | £41.06k | £34.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.97k | £23.32k | £34.17k | £45.47k | £38.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 30 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 13 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 13 December 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED 26 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY IMMUNE AND AUTO IMMUNE ILLNESSES BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, BLACKPOOL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window