THE COVENTRY MUSLIM SWAHILI ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Masjid and Madrasah Project Qur-an Classes for youngsters, Short Courses and Ramadhan lectures, Funeral Services, Religious Congregations and Eid Council, Working together with other charity organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Coventry City
Governance
- 17 November 2008: Standard registration
- COMSWA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IBRAHIM JAFFAR SHAURI | Chair | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Salum | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suleiman Ali | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sayid Ali Abdullahi | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saleh Badru Ali | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Khalfan Mohammed Ayoub | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keis Omar Keis | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nassor Uba Nassor | Trustee | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
AXMED SAYID CALI | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.74k | £54.32k | £106.44k | £96.75k | £110.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.70k | £23.89k | £33.51k | £45.87k | £38.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2011
Charitable objects
2:1 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG SWAHILI MUSLIM PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN COVENTRY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MEANS OF> (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION. (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT. (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSON. 2:2 TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF COVENTRY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. 2:3 TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND TO ORGANISE FAITH CONGREGATIONS. 2:4 THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY :- (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUP. (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE 2:5 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF MUSLIM WOMEN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY. (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION : AND (C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
88 Paynes Lane
COVENTRY
CV1 5LJ
- Phone:
- 07377076627
- Email:
- THECOMSWA@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.COMSWA.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window