Wild Africa Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the awareness and education of the public on wildlife conservation and the causes of environmental degradation or concern. The mission of Wild Africa Fund is to be the leading environmental communicator in Africa and to support on the ground conservation programs primarily in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
Governance
- 24 September 2008: Standard registration
- WILDAID UK (Previous name)
- WILDAID UK - CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamara Mary Gabriella Gray | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Augusta Verdon-Roe | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID KNIGHTS | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.13k | £57.07k | £56.85k | £30.54k | £24.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.58k | £75.04k | £77.90k | £45.00k | £4.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1 AUGUST 2008 as amended on 19 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, INCLUDING THE PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS INCLUDING THE CONSERVATION AND SUSTAINABLE USE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE CAUSES OF ENVIRONMENTAL DEGRADATION OR CONCERN AND; TO CARRY OUT OR ASSIST IN THE CARRYING OUT OF RESEARCH INTO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ECOLOGICAL SYSTEMS AND THE IMPACT ON THESE OF BOTH NATURAL AND ANTHROPOGENIC ACTIVITIES AND TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
GLOBAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westcotts
Timberley
South Street
AXMINSTER
Devon
EX13 5AD
- Phone:
- 01297 33388
- Email:
- alexhofford@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window