THE CIVIC MEDIA PLATFORM LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable activities are a) the relief of hardship of the population of the Middle East who have needs by reason of their gender, age, geographic location, disability, refugee status and/or social and economic circumstances; b) to promote sustainable development and c) to develop media content that promotes civic values in the Middle East and promote the advancement of its culture and heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Norway
Governance
- 08 January 2009: Standard registration
- DRT (Working name)
- THE DAMASK ROSE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RIM TURKMANI | Chair | 15 March 2007 |
|
|||||
MR CHRIS DOYLE | Trustee | 02 August 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18 | £226.99k | £341.32k | £797.34k | £356.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.76k | £183.93k | £200.93k | £859.19k | £394.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £797.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £859.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.26k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £850.93k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 August 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 August 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 September 2020 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 2008 as amended on 06 Mar 2019 as amended on 23 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are to relieve distress and hardship and promote the sustainable welfare and development of, and good quality education for the population of the Middle East, and to promote the advancement of traditional arts, culture and heritage of The Middle East, including through: (a) the provision, promotion and support of sustainable development projects and initiatives that benefit disadvantaged members of the population of the Middle East; (b) the provision of scholarships to disadvantaged individuals and the promotion and provision of support (financial or otherwise) of organisations, projects or initiatives that improve or provide education for disadvantaged members of the population of the Middle East; (c) the provision of support (financial or otherwise) of projects and initiatives that preserve and develop the traditional arts, crafts and culture of The Middle East; (d) the provision, promotion and support of civic society values and respect of human rights in the Middle East through the development and promotion of media content that promotes these values. (d) such other activities in furtherance of the Charity’s objects which are charitable in English Law and as the Trustees may from time to time consider appropriate. In pursuance of these objects, and where possible, the Charity shall aim to support community and family based solutions. Priority will be given to children and young people, disabled people, women, rural residents, refugees and the elderly, without differentiation on the grounds of religion, gender or ethnicity.
Area of benefit
THE SYRIAN ARAB REPUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARAB BRITISH CENTRE LTD
1 GOUGH SQUARE
LONDON
EC4A 3DE
- Phone:
- 02089947228
- Email:
- civicmediaplatform@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window