THE KEVIN SPACEY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The foundations inaugural project was Richards Rampage which was a creative learning initiative spanning eight countries and three continents and offering 632 students and 162 emerging artists a unique opportunity to connect with Kevin Spacey and one another. The foundation has been researching and developing partnerships for two new initiatives: The KSF Grants and the KSF Scholarships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 October 2008: Standard registration
- 25 June 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- KSF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £439.87k | £21.02k | £183.63k | £402.84k | £123.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.01k | £254.40k | £167.25k | £233.44k | £288.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 29 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 29 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 08 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 08 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 01 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 30 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 2008 AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR THE CREATIVE ARTS, FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT ; PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF WRITERS ACTORS, PRODUCERS AND DIRECTORS IN THE CREATIVE ARTS; AND CARRY OUT ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window