CIRCUS ARTS FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?To raise the profile of circus as a cultural activity ?To ensure that circus is a viable industry offering secure and worthwhile employment ?To promote training and sharing of skills ?To provide a forum between the different facets of the industry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Verena Cornwall | Chair |
|
||||||
Matilda Smith-Cornwall | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
TONY HOPKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VERENA CORNWALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £92 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE DEMONSTRATION OF CIRCUS SKILLS IN ARTISTIC PERFORMANCE. B TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE CREATIVE AND ARTISTIC APPLICATION OF CIRCUS SKILLS IN ARTISTIC PERFORMANCE. C TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF THE CIRCUS AS A CULTURAL ACTIVITY. D TO CREATE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES IN CIRCUS ARTS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS MAY DETERMINE. E. TO PROMOTE TRAINING IN, AND SHARING OF, CIRCUS SKILLS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southgate Chambers
37 Southgate Street
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO23 9EH
- Phone:
- 01962864124
- Email:
- combarts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window