Financial history AL-WADUD WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1128666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.91k £7.20k £5.12k £4.00k £3.15k
Total expenditure £3.90k £3.05k £4.77k £4.13k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A