Accounts and annual returns DAYSTAR MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1126317
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
Annual return 14 July 2023 31 July 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2023 31 July 2024 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2022 16 August 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2022 16 August 2023 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2021 19 June 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2021 20 June 2022 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 14 July 2020 18 May 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 July 2020 Not Required