DAYSTAR MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR PUBLIC MEETING TO ENLIGHTEN THE GENERAL PUBLIC ON THE MESSAGE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 16 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CECILIA OLUODOJUTIMI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Oluseyi Tijani | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA OMOREGIE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/07/2019 | 14/07/2020 | 14/07/2021 | 14/07/2022 | 14/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.54k | £24.60k | £25.47k | £38.97k | £37.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.12k | £26.04k | £25.72k | £38.05k | £37.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days | |
Annual return | 14 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 July 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 July 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2021 | 20 June 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND BY PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND RECORDED MATERIAL TO ENLIGHTEN OTHER ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
143 CAISTOR PARK ROAD
LONDON
E15 3PR
- Phone:
- 07414922075
- Email:
- daystarministries@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window