The Free Oxygen Project

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING PROGRAM TO PROVIDE SKILLS FOR LIFE. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS FOR THE DISADVANTAGES IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 October 2008: Standard registration
- CARE FOR ALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fina Otti | Chair | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Osuji | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £25.83k | £216 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.22k | £24.52k | £1.26k | £210 | £240 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2025 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 March 2025 | 855 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 AUGUST 2008 as amended on 16 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING PROGRAMMES TO PROVIDE SKILLS FOR LIFE. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS FOR THE DISADVANTAGED IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
253 Liverpool Road
Ground Floor Offices
Islington
London
N1 1LX
- Phone:
- 03330118026
- Email:
- info@freeoxygenproject.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window