THE LATIN PROGRAMME-VIA FACILIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Latin Programme - Via Facilis improves English literacy in state primary schools through the study of Latin and English grammar. Classes taught range from years 3 to 6. The work done in class and the lesson plans are tailored to meet the needs of both the school and the pupils, with a focus on mixed abilities and different learning strategies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 November 2008: Standard registration
- THE CAGSE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Cheryl Teresa Day | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Katharine Anne Swire | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Margaret Illingworth | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zipporah Alice Woolfson | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.79k | £57.19k | £156.28k | £199.67k | £132.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.93k | £111.72k | £181.61k | £172.64k | £164.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.60k | £9.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF CLASSICS; AND TO INCREASE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN TO RECEIVE AN EDUCATION IN CLASSICS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 285
124 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07794978347
- Email:
- info@thelatinprogramme.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window