CHRISTLIKE DISCIPLEMAKERS MOVEMENT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christlike Disciplemakers Movement UK is involved in evangelism, teaching of the Word of God, training and building leadership capacity for churches and other charitable organisations. The charity supports the poor in our society by praying with them and helping them with their needs. We make disciples of all natons, teaching them to observe all things. We stand for the Great Commision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- Leeds City
- Throughout London
- Belgium
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Netherlands
- Norway
- South Africa
- Togo
- United States
Governance
- 02 January 2009: Standard registration
- CDMUK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr EDDIE THABO MOREKO | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA OWUSU ACHIAW | Trustee | 27 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL EBO ACQUAH | Trustee | 27 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PRISCILLA MAWUDUDZI DUMENU | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PRECIOUS ELIKPLIM DUMENU | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDITH-NELLY AKOSUA DUMENU | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £400 | £410 | £120 | £70 | |
|
Total expenditure | £150 | £180 | £360 | £70 | £45 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 January 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AT PART V OF THIS CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 CHESTER ROAD
LONDON
N9 8JG
- Phone:
- 07903521343
- Email:
- cdmuk@rocketmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window