Financial history GOLDHEART CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1127178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £737.78k £1.72m £548.58k £402.07k £397.91k
Total expenditure £1.02m £475.85k £1.16m £842.91k £551.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £547.74k £1.36m £202.14k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £856.73k £202.14k N/A N/A
Income - Investment £190.05k £366.61k £346.44k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £500.00k £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £986.27k £418.09k £1.07m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.17k £57.76k £90.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £12.83k £17.65k £33.90k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £973.44k £400.44k £1.04m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £35.17k £57.76k £90.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A