Accounts and annual returns MAKING THE CHANGE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1127567
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 13 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 13 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 30 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 30 September 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 22 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 22 October 2012 On Time