S.H.A.R.E. (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the elderly in the area of Romania with food and to provide a area for a Kindergart for children of the area en
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 08 October 2008: Standard registration
- S.H.A.R.E. (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Ann ELWELL | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine ELWELL | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
FLORENCE MARIE HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WALTER HENRY ELWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.28k | £7.56k | £8.38k | £8.72k | £6.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39k | £6.01k | £8.47k | £7.76k | £5.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTIVES INITIALLY BUT NO EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF ROMANIA. 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH OUT STATEMENT OF FAITH (BELIEF). 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 3) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 4. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 ST. GODRICS ROAD
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 5JJ
- Phone:
- 01325307286
- Email:
- WALTERELWELL3@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window