Financial history LET'S CONNECT (ENG) LTD

Charity Number: 1125924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.52m £485.39k £455.08k £631.80k £454.17k
Total expenditure £1.57m £483.44k £559.09k £711.69k £495.50k
Income from government contracts £1.01m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £380.03k £199.45k £244.04k £175.68k £140.66k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.43m N/A N/A £555.90k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £93.46k N/A N/A £75.82k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £70 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.57m N/A N/A £711.69k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A