LET'S CONNECT (ENG) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Let's Connect objectives are: Establishing client's goals and strengths. The resulting treatment plan may include: Talking therapy; Practical help; Supporting engagement in social activities; Physical activity; Workshops to (i) address conditions such as depression (ii) teach relaxation skills Courses designed to build confidence to enter education, volunteering or employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £140,656 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 17 September 2008: Standard registration
- 13 January 2015: Funds received from 1072669 HARTLEPOOL MIND
- HARTLEPOOL AND EAST DURHAM MIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Stuart Mayes | Trustee | 27 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Louise Ayres Nicholson | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cawley | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emilie Susan De Bruijn | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52m | £485.39k | £455.08k | £631.80k | £454.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57m | £483.44k | £559.09k | £711.69k | £495.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.01m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £380.03k | £199.45k | £244.04k | £175.68k | £140.66k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.43m | N/A | N/A | £555.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £93.46k | N/A | N/A | £75.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £70 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.57m | N/A | N/A | £711.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/03/2012 as amended on 02 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT IN HARTLEPOOL AND SURROUNDING AREAS ( EXCLUDING AREAS THAT ARE SERVICED BY OTHER MIND ORGANISATIONS ) " THE AREA OF BENEFIT " IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lets Connect (England) Ltd
1 Tees Street
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS24 8HB
- Phone:
- 01429269303
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window