DONCASTER SCOUT COUNCIL - SQUIRREL WOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Squirrel Wood Campsite is a 72 acre Woodland site of oustanding natural beauty. Our aim is to share the woodland environment with people of all ages, from young to not so young! We provide a safe area for everyone to enjoy the surroundings, learn about nature & the great outdoors, have fun on activities whilst also meeting other people & making new friends from all over Great Britain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 22 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH HOWITT | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|||||
CLIVE SCOTT | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|||||
JOANNE COOPER | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|||||
ROBERT PARKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.43k | £15.49k | £26.86k | £43.50k | £40.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.10k | £13.23k | £23.71k | £32.89k | £41.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 January 2025 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 January 2025 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 256 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL; AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Aintree Drive
Balby
DONCASTER
DN4 8TU
- Phone:
- 07971607659
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window