Australian Wildlife Conservancy United Kingdom

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FoAWC is a UK charity established in 2008 dedicated to the conservation of Australian wildlife. Australia's wildlife is facing an extinction crisis and existing approaches to conservation are no longer adequate. FoAWC works with Australian Wildlife Conservancy, a leading non-profit organisation based in Australia, to ensure this wave of extinction does not continue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Wandsworth
- Australia
Governance
- 13 November 2008: Standard registration
- AUSTRALIAN WILDLIFE TRUST (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF AUSTRALIAN WILDLIFE CONSERVANCY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Coniston Mills | Chair | 29 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Mulley | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Adam Charles Hain | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Sawicki | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.49k | £131.36k | £126.13k | £176.56k | £315.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.61k | £135.99k | £127.30k | £164.43k | £246.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/11/2015 as amended on 05 Oct 2022 as amended on 17 Sept 2024 as amended on 05 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
3.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION BY SUPPORTING THE PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN AUSTRALIA OR ANY ASPECT OF IT (INCLUDING ITS NATIVE FLORA AND FAUNA); AND 3.2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROMOTING, FOSTERING, DEVELOPING AND ASSISTING THE STUDY OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN AUSTRALIA OR ANY ASPECT OF IT (INCLUDING ITS NATIVE FLORA AND FAUNA), AND SUPPORTING THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE AND INFORMATION RELATING TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN AUSTRALIA (INCLUDING ITS NATIVE FLORA AND FAUNA) OR ANY ASPECT OF IT.
Area of benefit
AUSTRALIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
82C PORTLAND PLACE
LONDON
W1B 1NS
- Phone:
- 07917071368
- Email:
- FOAWC@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window