THE SIMPSON MCCREATH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Simpson McCreath Trust supports a wide variety of organisations within the Borough of Berwick-upon-Tweed, with small donations to adhere to specific objectives. Grants normally range in size between -?500 and -?5,000. Most grants are made under the general headings of Sports, The Arts, Health & Social Welfare, Education, Community Facilities and the Environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northumberland
Governance
- 19 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eva Simpson | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail McCreath | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ellis Simpson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY ROBSON MCCREATH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.36k | £5.60k | £13.22k | £17.15k | £27.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.93k | £12.10k | £8.72k | £9.65k | £36.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED MADE 6 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHER THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") WHICH SHALL BE FURTHERED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS DESCRIBES: - A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION B) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH. C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. D) THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. E) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. F) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE FURTHER PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF THE TRUST SHALL BE PRIMARILY THE ADMINISTRATIVE BOROUGH OF BERWICK UPON TWEED, NORTHUMBERLAND.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TWEED VALLEY MALTINGS
TWEEDSIDE TRADING ESTATE
BERWICK UPON TWEED
NORTHUMBERLAND
TD15 2UZ
- Phone:
- 01289330033
- Email:
- malt@simpsonsmalt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window