Financial history THE M H CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1126026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/06/2020 25/06/2021 25/06/2022 25/06/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £11.82k £8.52k £7.33k £6.37k £8.04k
Total expenditure £7.97k £6.00k £3.50k £3.80k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A