THE CENTIPEDE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centipede Trust raises funds for Plymouth Child Development Centre (CDC) to help provide facilities, services and equipment. The CDC includes outpatient, assessment services and therapies for children who may have a variety of conditions, many with severe physical and learning disabilities. An assessment group for children under 5 provides intervention and supporting strategies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 17 October 2008: Standard registration
- 01 December 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.51k | £4.37k | £8 | £8 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £405 | £541 | £717 | £718 | £614 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (AND THEIR FAMILIES) WHO ARE PATIENTS OR FORMER PATIENTS OF THE CHILD HEALTH DIRECTORATE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, TRAINING AND SUPPORT WHICH MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF SUCH PATIENTS. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE NEEDS OF PATIENTS OF THE CHILD DEVELOPMENT CENTRE, (ACUTE AND COMMUNITY) AND OTHER SUCH PERSONS IN THE COMMUNITY AND TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST AND SUPPORT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SAID CHILD DEVELOPMENT CENTRE.
Area of benefit
THE PLYMOUTH CHILD DEVELOPMENT CENTRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window