TUBESTATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tubestation seeks creative ways to use its resources and links to benefit people and build community, particularly within the surf and coastal culture of Cornwall UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 22 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gabriella Askwith Mrs | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Daniel Jones | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phil Williams | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.81k | £154.22k | £219.27k | £135.75k | £162.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.91k | £159.68k | £177.10k | £196.32k | £195.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.81k | £34.32k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 8 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2008 AND 9 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND MAINTAIN A CHRISTIAN WITNESS WITHIN THE SURFING COMMUNITY. TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF POLZEATH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE FACILITIES AND RESOURCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND PROMOTING A GREATER SENSE OF COMMUNITY COHESION. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING A WARM SAFE PLACE TO MEET TOGETHER AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS BY WAY OF IMPROVING THEIR ACCESS TO CULTURE, SPORT AND PLAY AND POSITIVE OUT OF SCHOOL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
POLZEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tubestation
Polzeath Methodist Church
Polzeath
Trebetherick
WADEBRIDGE
PL27 6TB
- Phone:
- 01208869200
- Email:
- enquiries@tubestation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window