ST MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 . To advance the religion of the Jacobite Syrian Orthodox Church in Greater Manchester and India by maintaining the faith, tradition and doctrines of the Jacobite Syrian Orthodox church and shall perform all the religious rites and sacraments to all its members in accordance with the ancient Syrian Orthodox tradition. 2. To relieve poverty and sickness in Greater Manchester and India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
92 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
- India
Governance
- 22 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LILU PULIKKUNNEL VARGHESE FR | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
KURIAKOSE KOCHUPARAMBIL JOSEPH | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||
AJEESH CHERIAN | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|||||
BIJOY ALIAS | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
SAJU PAPPACHAN | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
KERNAL EAPEN | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
SINDU SAJU | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
ELDO PERINGATTEL KURIAKOSE | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
JOBIN GEORGE | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
BINU THANKACHAN | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
BASIL SUNNY | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
THOMAS OLAKKATTU CHACKO | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|||||
THOMAS PAUL | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.41k | £25.91k | £117.69k | £379.85k | £311.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.41k | £17.77k | £202.08k | £343.16k | £343.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 2005 AMENDED 13 MAY 2007 AMENDED 13 JANUARY 2008 AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF THE JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN GREATER MANCHESTER AND ADJOINING PLACES OF THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND PARTICULARLY BY: TO MAINTAIN FAITH, TRADITIONS AND DOCTRINES OF THE JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH AND SHALL PERFORM ALL THE RELIGIOUS RITES AND SACRAMENTS TO ALL ITS MEMBERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ANCIENT SYRIAN ORTHODOX TRADITIONS. TO CONDUCT HOLY EUCHARIST, SACRAMENTS AND SERVICES ACCORDING TO THE FAITH, TRADITIONS, CUSTOMS AND RITES OF THE JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH AS UNDER HIS HOLINESS THE PATRIARCH OF ANTIOCH AND ALL THE EAST. TO PROVIDE HOLY SACRAMENTS TO AL ITS MEMBERS AND EVANGELISATIONS. TO ESTABLISH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION FOR THE WELFARE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND FOR THE POOR AND NEEDY. TO ORGANISE AND CONDUCT SUNDAY SCHOOL, PRAYER MEETINGS, RETREATS, YOUTH ASSOCIATION AND VANITHA SAMAJAM (WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION) ETC. TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHURCH. TO ORGANISE ACTIVITIES FOR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT AND SPREADING OF THE UNIVERSAL (JACOBITE) SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH. TO BUY, RENT, LEASE OR ACQUIRE THE PROPERTY AND MANAGE IT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHURCH. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN GREATER MANCHESTER, NORTH WEST PART OF ENGLAND AND INDIA.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys J S O Church Manchester
Moffat Close
BOLTON
BL2 6UA
- Phone:
- 07866015655
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window