THE VIPINGO VILLAGE FUND

Charity Number: 1126196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Future Hope School in Vipingo was opened in January 2010. We currently have 162 children all affected by HIV in some way. We have 8 classrooms, library, dining hall, kitchen, school office & a toilet block with running water from our own bore hole which ensures a continuous supply of clean drinking water. The children are fed 2-3 meals a day. We provide primary & fund some secondary education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £107,336
Total expenditure: £124,356

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Hardman Chair
None on record
CAROL HARDMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.33k £98.33k £152.13k £141.60k £107.34k
Total expenditure £146.02k £96.29k £147.60k £147.61k £124.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 January 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 January 2024 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 January 2022 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 January 2022 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 23 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Old Chapel
Ewhurst Green
ROBERTSBRIDGE
TN32 5TD
Phone:
+447530819844