BROXTOWE WOMEN'S PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Broxtowe Women's Project Limited (BWP) ensure women, children and young people affected by domestic abuse are supported and empowered to be safe and in control of their lives. Website: www.broxtowewomensproject.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £24,840 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- BWP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Wallace Ms | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Currer | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Cooney | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Debra Gibson | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Olewe-Richards | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.45k | £245.59k | £325.30k | £243.33k | £362.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.09k | £242.18k | £243.31k | £242.77k | £355.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.50k | £23.00k | £13.50k | £31.23k | £24.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED SUCH ABUSE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Union House
111 New Union Street
Coventry
CV1 2NT
- Phone:
- 01773718555
- Email:
- enquiries@broxtowewp.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window