Financial history Sun Kyeong Qi

Charity Number: 1133398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £455.95k £404.29k £625.67k £649.03k £296.33k
Total expenditure £686.03k £542.46k £537.65k £480.99k £423.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £65.72k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £341.66k £199.10k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £180.27k £255.82k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £103.75k £194.11k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £537.65k £480.99k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £7.44k £18.11k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A