Trustees THE KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1125940

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Holland-Hibbert | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Willie Gething | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gigi Yacoub | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdi Aden | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abdurahman Sayed | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Winslow | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BRIANCE | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MIRANDA FERGUSON | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||
MARTIN WILLIAM HOWARD MORGAN | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.