EAST MIDLANDS DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue and re-home abandoned and unwanted dogs. We make sure that all dogs are neutered,vaccinated and microchipped before rehoming. Prospective new homes and owners are checked prior to re-homing the dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew McCluskey | Chair | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY JAYNE ISON | Trustee | 28 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA MCCLUSKY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan lynne SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.17k | £150.76k | £146.66k | £176.89k | £216.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.71k | £158.80k | £147.22k | £168.21k | £209.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.77k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF AN PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DOGS OR ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN THE COUNTIES OF LEICESTER, DERBY, NOTTINGHAM, WARWICKSHIRE AND LINCOLNSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE DOGS OR ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHICH ARE UNWANTED OR HAVE BEEN NEGLECTED, ABANDONED, DISCARDED OR GIVEN AWAY ("RESCUE DOGS").
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PINGLE FARM
SEINE LANE
ENDERBY
LEICESTER
LE19 4PD
- Phone:
- 01162864266
- Email:
- sandymccluskey59@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window