THE K T WONG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote cross-cultural collaboration in arts & education between China and the wider world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
- France
- South Africa
Governance
- 31 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LADY LINDA LIN TYE WONG DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clara Chooi | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.48k | £11.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.48k | £11.89k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 04 March 2025 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE CHARITABLE FROM TIME TO TIME UNDER ENGLISH LAW INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROMOTION OF MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND CULTURAL RELATIONS BETWEEN THE PEOPLE OF CHINA AND THE PEOPLES OF EUROPE PRINCIPALLY BY PROMOTING AND COMMISSIONING CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN BOTH EUROPE AND CHINA THAT WILL PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO INCREASE MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND CULTURAL CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE PEOPLES OF CHINA AND THE PEOPLES OF EUROPE.
Area of benefit
EUROPE AND CHINA
Contact information
- Address:
-
EK Williams Accountants Ltd
1 Pavilion Square
Westhoughton
Bolton
BL5 3AJ
- Phone:
- 02079372226
- Email:
- OFFICE@KTWONG.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window