SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE PLATO TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation for people with recovering mental health issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 30 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER EWAN LAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Markham | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Robert Yates | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.08k | £356.82k | £361.25k | £370.53k | £412.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.12k | £282.05k | £292.56k | £312.86k | £380.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF HOMES AND FOR THE RELIEF OR REHABILITATION OF EX-PSYCHIATRIC PATIENTS AND OTHER PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISTURBANCE WITHIN THE SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE DISTRICT OF [THE WARWICKSHIRE AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY AS DEFINED IN JUNE 1981]
Area of benefit
SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Warwickshire Plato Trust
172 Emscote Road
Warwick
CV34 5QN
- Phone:
- 01926831290
- Email:
- phil.plato@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window