BATHSHAN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE HOST CONFERENCES, TEACH, HELP WITH CHILDREN's HOMES, WE HOLD CHURCH MEETINGS HELP SET UP WIDOWS, COUNSEL PEOPLE WITH ADDICTIONS WE HOLD PRAYER MEETINGS. NEXT FINANCIAL YEAR, HAVE MISSON TRIPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Brent
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
Governance
- 09 October 2008: Standard registration
- 18 June 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 June 2021: Funds transferred to 1190267 Bethshan Foundation Ltd
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.20k | £136.64k | £204.69k | £345.11k | £385.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.54k | £121.13k | £202.58k | £318.67k | £345.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2020
(These accounts |
19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2019
(These accounts |
16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 18 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2018
(These accounts |
18 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 11 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2017
(These accounts |
11 May 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 18 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AT HOME OR OVERSEAS THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE OBJECTIVE NOT CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE THE CHARITY WILL BENEFIT ALL AGES AND GENDERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window