Accounts and annual returns RIVERSIDE DAY NURSERY (READING) LTD

Charity Number: 1126904
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 15 December 2016 45 days late