Accounts and annual returns THE HEREFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION'S ACADEMY ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1126273
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2010 02 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 26 July 2011 26 days late
Annual return 31 August 2009 22 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 19 March 2010 On Time