Financial history ICOULD LIMITED

Charity Number: 1126325
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £303.56k £481.30k £236.99k £342.79k £522.36k
Total expenditure £400.24k £358.00k £360.26k £361.79k £561.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £11.76k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £465.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £57.24k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £123
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £549.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.49k