ALL SOULS BOLTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To create and deliver a community hub in the heart of Crompton, Bolton, that delivers community and heritage programmes that improve peoples quality of life and services that help to stimulate local enterprise, employment and skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Total income includes £600 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 01 June 2009: Standard registration
- 08 April 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 April 2019: Funds transferred to 258612 CHURCHES CONSERVATION TRUST
- ALL SOULS CROMPTON COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.21k | £182.24k | £279.76k | £177.90k | £73.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.95k | £82.11k | £245.08k | £218.24k | £145.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £73.86k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 27 July 2018 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 27 July 2018 | 57 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 27 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 27 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 10 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 07 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/04/2014
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ALL SOULS TO INHABITANTS OF THE CROMPTON WARD AREA OF BOLTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, HERITAGE INITIATIVES AND TO PROVIDE RESOURCE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE PROJECTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3.2 TO DEVELOP AND PROMOTE A COMMUNITY SPIRIT THROUGH EDUCATION, LEISURE AND ARTS PROJECTS AT ALL SOULS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO THROUGH THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE OR SUPPORT SCHEMES WHERE SUCH PERSONS MAY RECEIVE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO ASSIST THEM IN OBTAINING EMPLOYMENT AND ALSO IN PARTICULAR TO IMPROVE THEIR FINANCIAL SITUATION -OF SUCH PERSONS BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE FORMATION AND DEVELOPMENT BY SUCH PERSONS OF WORK BASED LOCAL OR COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES. 3.3 IN THE INTEREST OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE, TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COMMUNITY FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAID FACILITIES (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS (WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON WOMEN, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE). 3.4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
CROMPTON WARD AREA OF BOLTON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window