Financial history ABUNDANT LIFE LIVING HOPE INTERNATIONAL MISSIONS

Charity number: 1126717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/02/2020 16/02/2021 16/02/2022 16/02/2023 16/02/2024
Total gross income £116.15k £97.14k £104.31k £122.22k £89.28k
Total expenditure £115.98k £76.99k £128.38k £105.32k £111.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A