WILDLIFE SOS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wildlife SOS was est in 1995 by a small group of individuals inspired to make lasting change to protect and conserve India's natural heritage, forest and wildlife wealth. Today, the organisation has evolved to actively work towards protecting Indian wildlife, inc elephants and bears, conserving habitat, studying biodiversity, and creating alternative and sustainable livelihoods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 30 October 2008: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 April 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TAMARISK GRUMMITT | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEETA SESHAMANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KARTICK SATYANARAYAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.71k | £411.42k | £430.80k | £131.03k | £109.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.28k | £248.72k | £319.95k | £423.64k | £117.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, BY MEANS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF BOTH WILD AND CAPTIVE WILDLIFE, BY ACTIVELY ASSISTING IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF PROJECTS TO ALLEVIATE INJURY, SICKNESS, ILL-TREATMENT, NEGLECT OR THREAT TO THESE ANIMALS AND THEIR ENVIRONMENT. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROTECTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF EXISTING WILDLIFE SOS RESCUE AND REHABILITATION CENTRES IN INDIA FOR SLOTH BEARS, ASIAN ELEPHANTS, TIGERS, LEOPARDS, DEER AND OTHER WILDLIFE. (2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES THAT RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS BOTH NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY, OF THE PROBLEMS FACING WILD AND CAPTIVE WILDLIFE. BY SUPPORTING AND CONDUCTING RESEARCH INITIATIVES THAT INVESTIGATE THE LONG-TERM SUSTAINABILITY OF WILDLIFE AND THE ENVIRONMENT - PLUS, WHERE POSSIBLE, PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (3) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INDIGENOUS TRIBES AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES, IN INDIA BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
483 GREEN LANES
LONDON
N13 4BS
- Phone:
- 07977001760
- Email:
- info@wildlifesos.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window