Accounts and annual returns CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH KINGDOM BUILDERS

Charity Number: 1126777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 10 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 20 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 01 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 16 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window