MOXAFRICA

Charity number: 1128408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To investigate whether moxibustion (a traditional East Asian therapy closely allied to acupuncture) might help combat the emerging threat of drug-resistant tuberculosis mainly in the developing world. To promote and carry out worldwide, for the public benefit, research into potential treatments using moxibustion to enhance whatever conventional medical treatment provision is available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £5,509
Total expenditure: £11,313

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Sandwell
  • Japan
  • North Korea
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MERLIN YOUNG Chair
None on record
YUKI ITAYA Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record
Josie Underhill Trustee
None on record
JENNY CRAIG Trustee
None on record
SISTER BERNADETTE ARSCOTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.97k £3.62k £5.20k £1.63k £5.51k
Total expenditure £8.43k £184 £1.21k £6.97k £11.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
103 CHESTNUT ROAD
OLDBURY
B68 0AY
Phone:
01214213480