SHREE RAM MANDIR / SHREE JALARAM BHAJAN MANDAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Opens every day for religious activities. Also all festivals are celebrated at the centre.Opens once a month for Bhojan Bhandaro and every Thursday for group activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tameside
Governance
- 10 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHANDRAKANT MISTRY | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bharatkumar Vallabhbhai Mistry | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sumitra Nathoo | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
KISHOR KUMAR LAD | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damyanti Mistry | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jasuben Mistry | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shardaben Patel | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bharatkumar Lad | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ISHWER JAGA GOPAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.67k | £83.60k | £188.79k | £209.21k | £149.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.79k | £10.06k | £19.90k | £14.66k | £24.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE HUNDU RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES (PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS) PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON HINDUISM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE HINDU FALTTY RELIGION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF HINDUISM. 3) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY AND CULTURAL CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY, IN FURTHERANCE OF ITS OBJECT (1) AND (2).
Area of benefit
UNEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 KENYON STREET
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL6 7DU
- Phone:
- 01613434639
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window