BETHLEHEM CHURCH OF CHRIST IN MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, SERVICES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 02 October 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 October 2017: Re-registered
- 09 September 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 December 2018: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANA FERNADO DA SILVA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PIERRE NGANZIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.60k | £6.00k | £600 | £5.99k | £6.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.97k | £5.25k | £5.25k | £5.25k | £5.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROPAGATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND PROCLAIMING THE KINGDOM OF GOD THROUGH PREACHING TH WORD OF GOD, LECTURES, PRAYERS, PUBLICATIONS AND BY ENSURING SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND PROMOTING PHYSICAL WELL-BEING OF MEMBERS AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO LIVE A LIFE OF RIGHTEOUSNESS, HOLINESS AND PREVAILING PRAYER. 2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING CARE FOR THE NEEDY AND BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER CHARITIES AND CHRISTIAN ORGANISATIONS TO OFFER HELP, BOTH FINANCIALLY AND OTHERWISE TO DISASTERS, VICTIMS OF WAR, AND OTHER MISFORTUNE BOTH LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.ADVOCACY. F) THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROMOTION OF GOOD PRACTICE STANDARDS FOR ADVOCACY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Ruskin House (Croydon) Ltd
Croydons Labour & Trade Union Centr
23 Coombe Road
CROYDON
CR0 1BD
- Phone:
- 07466822986
- Email:
- bccmministries@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window