FRIENDS OF MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOL FOR GIRLS CROSBY

Charity number: 1129058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the trust is to advance education at Merchant Taylors' School for Girls in Crosby in the County of Lancaster.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 April 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANET BRANIGAN Chair 04 October 2012
None on record
Marie-Claire Gervasoni Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Claire Tao Trustee 25 April 2018
LUCKLEY HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Kay Carroll Trustee 29 April 2015
None on record
BERYL FRANCES HOWARD Trustee
SEFTON NORTH DEANERY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £248 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £150 £150 £0 £150 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 RIVERSIDE
HIGHTOWN
LIVERPOOL
L38 0BU
Phone:
01519293617
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available