Accounts and annual returns RELATE WINCHESTER AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1128589
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 14 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 August 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 18 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 23 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 24 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 07 November 2012 On Time