Financial history NEW PATHWAYS FAMILY FRIENDLY THERAPEUTIC CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE

Charity Number: 1126120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.73m £3.22m £3.53m £3.49m £4.12m
Total expenditure £2.01m £2.78m £2.98m £3.45m £3.85m
Income from government contracts £163.63k £170.99k £284.16k £268.07k £360.50k
Income from government grants £683.28k £723.22k £1.01m £938.80k £1.11m
Income - Donations and legacies £432.27k £874.94k £1.25m £592.74k £771.90k
Income - Other trading activities £132.74k £211.20k £172.70k £230.54k £270.62k
Income - Charitable activities £2.15m £2.14m £2.11m £2.65m £3.06m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.80k £620 £0 £2.16k £11.47k
Income - Other £9.87k £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.00m £2.77m £2.96m £3.43m £3.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £16.97k £17.10k £22.07k £22.64k £22.90k
Expenditure - Governance £12.79k £13.98k £17.01k £22.71k £21.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0