Financial history DAGENHAM ISLAMIC WELFARE ASSOCIATION & MOSQUE

Charity Number: 1129870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £85.71k £103.05k £128.74k £148.72k £153.67k
Total expenditure £67.59k £66.56k £95.29k £114.65k £132.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A