LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF YSTRADGYNLAIS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Apply for Grants to assist the Hospital. Run Raffles etc; Organise Open Days with Stalls to assist the Hospital. Receive Donations from the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Powys
Governance
- 05 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER C BARROW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CAPTAIN PAUL GEORGE COLLIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.70k | £4.02k | £7.22k | £4.14k | £4.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.16k | £5.12k | £213 | £3.83k | £9.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 424 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/01/2009 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE LEAGUE SHALL BE TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL OR OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y Grithig
Penycae
Swansea
SA9 1GD
- Phone:
- 01639730099
- Email:
- collier_panda@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window